EP4120747 - TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Yu No.168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Siqi No.168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 03 /
JI, Zichao No.168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21767850.7 | 12.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021CN80398 | Priority number, date | CN202010177055 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010177055 | [2023/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021180197 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120747 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W76/28, H04L1/1829, H04L1/1867, // H04W88/04, H04L5/00, H04W74/08, H04W72/02, H04W72/25, H04L1/00, H04W92/18 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1607 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN);
H04W36/03 (KR);
H04W52/0212 (KR);
H04W52/0248 (CN,KR);
H04W52/028 (EP);
H04W56/001 (KR);
H04W72/02 (EP,KR);
H04W72/0446 (CN,KR);
H04W72/0457 (KR);
H04W72/12 (CN);
H04W72/1263 (KR);
H04W72/20 (CN);
H04W72/23 (CN);
H04W72/25 (EP,KR);
H04W72/56 (CN);
H04L2001/0092 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04W74/0808 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/03] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSKONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/03] | English: | TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSION ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | Translation filed | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 22.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016366645 (SONG SEONGWOOK [KR], et al); | [XYI]US2017041875 (LU QIANXI [CN], et al); | [Y]US2020059915 (LEE SEUNGMIN [KR], et al) | International search | [X]CN101617553 (NOKIA CORP); | [X]WO2018064477 (INTEL IP CORP [US]); | [X]CN109479189 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [PX]CN111800764 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD); |