EP4109833 - SIGNAL PRE-COMPENSATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DMITRY, Solovev Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Jie Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
TIAN, Jiashen Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21768053.7 | 02.03.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021CN78629 | Priority number, date | RU20200110701 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: RU 2020110701 | [2022/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021179953 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109833 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/50, H04B10/61, H04L27/36, H04B10/079, H04L25/03 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
H04L25/03343 (EP);
H04B10/58 (US);
H04B10/2543 (EP);
H04B10/6164 (EP);
H04L27/368 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | H04L25/49, H04B10/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIGNALVORKOMPENSATION | [2022/52] | English: | SIGNAL PRE-COMPENSATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRÉ-COMPENSATION DE SIGNAL | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2022 | Translation filed | 21.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2923442 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [Y]EP3000175 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]); | [Y]US2016352427 (ANANDAKUMAR ANAND [US], et al) | International search | [A]CN101675584 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD); | [A]CN103098392 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN103401513 (WUHAN RES INST POST & TELECOMM); | [A]CN104937841 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M); | [A]US2016352427 (ANANDAKUMAR ANAND [US], et al); | [A]CN107306241 (ZTE CORP) | by applicant | RU20200110701 |