EP4117418 - PELLET INSERTION APPARATUS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Trustees of Michigan State University 450 Administration Building East Lansing, MI 48824 / US | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISE, John C. 6013 Drumheller Rd. Bath, MI 48808 / US | 02 /
WISE, Alfred K. 712 Delaware Street Apartment 24 Perry, OK 73077 / US | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21768080.0 | 12.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021US22033 | Priority number, date | US202062989243P | 13.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062989243 P | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021183840 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4117418 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01G7/06, // A01M1/20, A01M21/04 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
A01G7/06 (EP);
A01G13/10 (US);
A01G23/00 (US);
A01M1/20 (EP,US);
A01M21/043 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/03] | A01G7/06, A01G7/00, A01G18/50, A01G18/55, A01G23/10, A01G29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | PELLETEINFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2023/03] | English: | PELLET INSERTION APPARATUS AND RELATED METHODS | [2023/03] | French: | APPAREIL D'INSERTION DE PASTILLE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 13.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5086584 (MERVING HANS A K [SE]); | [YA]CN107409571 (INSTITUTE OF PLANT PROT SHANXI ACADEMY OF AGRICULTURE SCIENCE) | International search | [A]US4698935 (CRONENWETT DUANE [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US7252042 (BLAKE GEORGE BEREND FREEMAN [CA]) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]GB2487721 (RUSSELL IPM LTD [GB]) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2013326944 (OBRIST GERY [CH], et al) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [A]WO2014094056 (EDWARDS INVEST PTY LTD P [AU]) [A] 1-26 * entire document * | by applicant | US5086584 | CN107409571 | WO2018169904 |