Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4117815 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202180026963 EP21768517 KR20227035168 US202016818061 US2021020994W



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20220147141Global Dossier 02.11.2022A
Priority number Date
WO2021US20994 05.03.2021
US202016818061 13.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115379895BGlobal Dossier 25.02.2025B
CN115379895 22.11.2022A
Priority number Date
WO2021US20994 05.03.2021
US202016818061 13.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4117815Global Dossier 01.05.2024A4
EP4117815 18.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2021US20994 05.03.2021
US202016818061 13.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021183372Global Dossier 16.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202016818061 13.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11000832Global Dossier 11.05.2021B1
Priority number Date
US202016818061 13.03.2020