Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.06.2024 | First examination report | |
17.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.11.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 | Change - classification | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 | Change - classification | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
12.05.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
12.05.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
27.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
22.07.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
09.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.05.2022 | Change - representative | |
17.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |