EP4205104 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SPEECH PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spotify AB Regeringsgatan 19 111 53 Stockholm / SE | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLYNN, John London N22 5EB / GB | 02 /
VAUGHAN, Felix London N22 5EB / GB | 03 /
QURESHI, Zeenat London N22 5EB / GB | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 5275 102 46 Stockholm / SE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21769174.0 | 27.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021GB52242 | Priority number, date | GB20200013585 | 28.08.2020 Original published format: GB 202013585 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022043713 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205104 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4205104 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G10L13/00 (EP);
G10L13/08 (GB,US);
G10L13/047 (US);
G10L13/04 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPRACHVERARBEITUNG | [2023/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SPEECH PROCESSING | [2023/27] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PAROLE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 14.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005256716 (BANGALORE SRINIVAS [US], et al); | [XAI]US2014114663 (LIN CHENG-YUAN [TW], et al); | [XAI]US9508341 (PARLIKAR ALOK ULHAS [US], et al) |