EP4200533 - PLAIN BEARING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | 20.10.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rübig Gesellschaft m.b.H & Co. KG Griesmühlstraße 4 4600 Wels / AT | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÜBIG, Bernd 4600 Wels / AT | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21769627.7 | 05.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021AT60271 | Priority number, date | AT20200060256 | 19.08.2020 Original published format: AT 602562020 | [2023/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022036379 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200533 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/02, F16C33/14, F16C33/04, C23C8/26, C23C8/38, C23C28/04 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
F16C33/043 (EP);
C23C28/04 (EP);
C23C28/042 (EP);
C23C28/046 (EP);
C23C28/048 (EP);
C23C8/02 (EP);
C23C8/26 (EP);
C23C8/38 (EP);
C23C8/80 (EP);
F16C33/14 (EP);
F16C17/02 (EP);
F16C2206/04 (EP);
F16C2206/58 (EP);
F16C2223/14 (EP);
F16C2223/60 (EP);
F16C2240/02 (EP);
F16C2240/06 (EP);
F16C2240/08 (EP);
F16C2240/22 (EP);
F16C2240/54 (EP);
F16C2240/60 (EP);
F16C2360/31 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | GLEITLAGERELEMENT | [2023/26] | English: | PLAIN BEARING ELEMENT | [2023/26] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE PALIER LISSE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 17.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - DALIBON E L ET AL, "Tribological behavior of DLC films deposited on nitrided and post-oxidized stainless steel by PACVD", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS: CONFERENCE SERIES, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20120619), vol. 370, no. 1, doi:10.1088/1742-6596/370/1/012029, ISSN 1742-6596, page 12029, XP020224837 [X] 1,4,5,7,8,13-17 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 8; figures 1-11; table 1 * [Y] 9-11 [I] 2,3,6,12,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1742-6596/370/1/012029 | [Y] - BEWILOGUA K ET AL, "Surface technology for automotive engineering", CIRP ANNALS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, CH, FR, vol. 58, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CIRP.2009.09.001, ISSN 0007-8506, (20090101), pages 608 - 627, (20091012), XP026770029 [Y] 9-11 * page 615, column right, paragraph 3.2.3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cirp.2009.09.001 | [Y] - VETTER J ED - MONTEMOR FÁTIMA, "60years of DLC coatings: Historical highlights and technical review of cathodic arc processes to synthesize various DLC types, and their evolution for industrial applications", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (20141025), vol. 257, doi:10.1016/J.SURFCOAT.2014.08.017, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 213 - 240, XP029080276 [Y] 9-11 * page 231, paragraph 4.11.5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfcoat.2014.08.017 | by applicant | DE102005043217 |