Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3175864 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2024 | C | CA3175864 | 17.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017018495 | 11.09.2020 | WO2021IB58066 | 03.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3994809 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2022 | B1 | EP3994809 | 11.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017018495 | 11.09.2020 | WO2021IB58066 | 03.09.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022053922 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017018495 | 11.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022085894 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2022 | A1 | US11277206 | 15.03.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US202017018495 | 11.09.2020 |