EP4210512 - ALGINATE-BASED SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONSALUD, Luis London Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
CLARK, Caroline W. H. High Point, North Carolina 27265 / US | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21770304.0 | 09.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021IB58220 | Priority number, date | US202063077064P | 11.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063077064 P | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053982 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210512 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24B13/00, A24B15/16, A24B15/30, A24D1/18, A61K9/00, A23L29/256, A23L29/294, A24F40/20 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
A23L29/256 (EP);
A24B15/16 (EP,KR);
A24B15/403 (KR,US);
A23L29/294 (EP);
A24B13/00 (EP,KR,US);
A24B15/167 (US);
A24B15/24 (KR);
A24B15/243 (KR);
A24B15/281 (EP,KR);
A24B15/284 (KR,US);
A24B15/287 (KR,US);
A24B15/302 (EP,KR);
A24B15/303 (EP,KR);
A24B15/308 (KR);
A24B15/32 (KR);
A24B15/38 (KR);
A24B15/40 (KR);
A24D1/20 (EP,KR,US);
A24D1/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0073 (EP,KR);
A61K9/5036 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | ALGINATBASIERTE SUBSTRATE | [2023/29] | English: | ALGINATE-BASED SUBSTRATES | [2023/29] | French: | SUBSTRATS À BASE D'ALGINATE | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 13.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0419974 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [X] 1-11,13-18,20-33,36,37,41,42,44-46 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005058078 (SOUZA CRUZ SA [BR], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11,13-15,18-30,32-37,41,42,45,46 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011083688 (MISHRA MUNMAYA K [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,16,20-34,36-39 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011104218 (KARLES GEORGIOS D [US], et al) [X] 23-33,35-39* the whole document *; | [X]WO2011117748 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,2,5,10-15,20-24,27,32-34,36,37,40-42,45-47 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2014083333 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [X] 1-7,10,11,13,16,17,20-29,32-34,36,37,41-43,45 * the whole document *; | [X]AU2012207021B (U S SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY LLC [US]) [X] 1-11,13-15,19-33,35-39 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2016184977 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO INVESTMENTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13,16,17,20-34,36,37,40-45,47 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2020025723 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13,16,20-34,36,37,40-45,47 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2020025727 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13,16,20-34,36,37,40-45,47 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2033909 | US2805669 | US3316919 | US3398754 | US3424171 | US3476118 | US3550598 | US3901248 | US4131117 | US4150677 | US4340073 | US4506682 | US4660577 | US4674519 | US4735217 | US4836224 | US4922901 | US4924888 | US4941484 | US4947874 | US4947875 | US4972854 | US4986286 | US4987906 | US5005593 | US5025814 | US5056537 | US5060669 | US5060671 | US5065775 | US5074319 | US5093894 | US5099862 | US5099864 | US5121757 | US5131415 | US5143097 | US5154192 | US5159942 | US5167244 | US5220930 | US5224498 | US5228460 | US5230354 | US5235992 | US5243999 | US5249586 | US5259403 | US5261424 | US5301694 | US5318050 | US5322076 | US5322075 | US5339838 | US5353813 | US5360023 | US5372148 | US5377698 | US5387416 | US5435325 | US5445169 | US5468936 | US5498850 | US5498855 | US5501237 | US5530225 | US5539093 | US5551451 | US5573692 | US5591368 | US5659656 | US5665262 | US5668295 | US5666977 | US5697385 | US5705624 | US5844119 | US5908032 | US5934289 | US5954979 | US5967148 | US6040560 | US6053176 | US6117455 | US6164287 | US6196218 | US6216706 | WO0237990 | US6701936 | US6730832 | US6772756 | US2004191322 | US6803545 | US6810883 | US2004255965 | US6854461 | US6895974 | WO2005063060 | US7011096 | US7017585 | US7025066 | US7040314 | US2006196518 | US2006236434 | US7173170 | US7208659 | US7230160 | US2007215167 | US7290549 | US7293565 | US2008196730 | WO2008103935 | US2008305216 | US2009044818 | US7513253 | US7556047 | US2009188490 | US7615184 | US2009293889 | WO2010003480 | US7647932 | US7650892 | US2010024834 | US7726320 | WO2010091593 | US7798153 | US7832410 | US2010291245 | US7836897 | US2010307518 | US7896006 | US2011139164 | US8061362 | US8079371 | US2012037175 | US2012055494 | US8156944 | US8186360 | US2012138073 | US2012138074 | US2012152265 | US8205622 | US8375957 | US8402976 | US2013074855 | US2013074856 | US8430106 | US8434496 | WO2013089551 | US2013152953 | US2013255702 | US2013274296 | US8689804 | US2014096781 | US8794231 | US8851083 | US8910639 | US8915254 | US8925555 | US8931493 | US8944072 | US2015068545 | US8991403 | US2015101627 | US9078473 | US9107453 | US2015230515 | US9220302 | US2016000140 | US2016073689 | US2016157515 | US2016192703 | US9423152 | US9484155 | US2017099877 | US2017112191 | US2017112196 | US9738622 | US9861773 | US9896429 | US10201187 | US2019082735 | US2019281891 | US10508096 | US10517332 | - IWAMOTO et al., AAPS Phann. Sci. Tech., (20020000), vol. 3, no. 3 | - NESTOR et al., Beitrage Tabakforsch. Int., (20030000), vol. 20, pages 467 - 475 | - STAAF et al., Beitrage Tabakforsch. Int., (20050000), vol. 21, pages 321 - 330 | - BOMBICK et al., Fund. Appl. Toxicol., (19970000), vol. 39, pages 11 - 17 | - SANTHOSH et al., Phytomedicine, (20050000), vol. 12, pages 216 - 220 | - PERFETTI, Beitrage Tabakforschung Int., (19830000), vol. 12, pages 43 - 54 | AU19500002762 |