Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
24.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
03.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.06.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
23.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
29.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.03.2023 | Change - representative | |
27.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.03.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
26.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.03.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
24.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |