EP4214423 - METHOD TO SELECT AN ELASTOMERIC MATERIAL FOR MAKING AN UNDERLAYER OF A BRAKING PAD AND CORRESPONDING BRAKING PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | 24.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Italia S.r.l. Corso Europa 41/43 20045 Lainate (MI) / IT | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIN XICOLA, Agustin 12032 Barge (CN) / IT | 02 /
BALESTRA, Simone 12032 Barge (CN) / IT | 03 /
IODICE, Valentina 12032 Barge (CN) / IT | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21770316.4 | 16.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021IB58461 | Priority number, date | IT20200021889 | 17.09.2020 Original published format: IT202000021889 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022058928 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214423 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02, F16D65/00, F16D65/092 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F16D65/0006 (EP);
F16D65/092 (EP);
F16D69/026 (EP);
F16D2069/005 (EP);
F16D2069/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINES ELASTOMEREN MATERIALS ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER UNTERSCHICHT EINES BREMSBELAGES UND ENTSPRECHENDER BREMSBELAG | [2023/30] | English: | METHOD TO SELECT AN ELASTOMERIC MATERIAL FOR MAKING AN UNDERLAYER OF A BRAKING PAD AND CORRESPONDING BRAKING PAD | [2023/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SÉLECTIONNER UN MATÉRIAU ÉLASTOMÈRE POUR FABRIQUER UNE SOUS-COUCHE D'UNE PLAQUETTE DE FREIN ET PLAQUETTE DE FREIN CORRESPONDANTE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5099962 (FURUSU KATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 9-11, 43-52 * * column 2, lines 3-21, 41-49 * * column 4, line 55 - column 7, line 17; figures 1, 3, 5, 6 *; | [IA]WO2007138168 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al) [I] 1 * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 6, lines 34-8 - page 7 * * page 11, line 36 - page 12, line 18; table 1 * [A] 2-15; | [A]US2010151186 (HEBERT LARRY S [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0 13] , [0 16] , [0 48]; table 1 *; | [A]US2014345990 (IKEDA TAKEHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] , [00 3] , [00 7] , [0 63] - [0065] - [ 118] , [ 119] *; | [I]US2017152904 (LEE JAE YOUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 13] , [0015] , [0021] , [0023] , [0036] , [0043] , [0044] , [0056] - [0056]; table 1 * | by applicant | - "Dynamic mechanical analysis", MENARD, K. P.MENARD, N., Encyclopedia of Analytical Chemistry: Applications, Theory and Instrumentation, (19990000), pages 14 - 16 | - WILLIAMS, MALCOLM L.ROBERT F. LANDELJOHN D. FERRY, Journal of the American Chemical society, (19550000), vol. 77, no. 14, pages 3701 - 3707 |