EP4101997 - WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/50] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UETA, Toshiro c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 02 /
HIRAYAMA, Michio c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 03 /
ENDO, Kazuomi c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21770420.4 | 19.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021JP01656 | Priority number, date | JP20200048693 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020048693 | [2022/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021186881 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101997 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4101997 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/26, G01G19/08, E02F3/43, E02F3/32 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
E02F3/435 (EP,US);
E02F9/264 (US);
E02F3/32 (EP,US);
E02F3/40 (US);
G01G19/08 (US);
G01G19/083 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | E02F9/26, G01G19/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2022/50] | English: | WORK MACHINE | [2022/50] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2022 | Translation filed | 08.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 06.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2370029 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]); | [A]JP2019158774 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [A]US2019360169 (TINKER MATTHEW M [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2000291076 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD); | [A]JP2019157362 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [A]JP2020033704 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) | by applicant | JP2019158774 |