Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4121883 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2021238378 EP21770762 US202016825812 US2021023209W US202318399113



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12223471Global Dossier 11.02.2025B2
US2024232808 11.07.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202318399113 28.12.2023
US202016825812 20.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2021238378Global Dossier 17.11.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202016825812 20.03.2020
WO2021US23209 19.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4121883Global Dossier 10.04.2024A4
EP4121883 25.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202016825812 20.03.2020
WO2021US23209 19.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021188930Global Dossier 23.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202016825812 20.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11900322Global Dossier 13.02.2024B2
US2021295266 23.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202016825812 20.03.2020