EP4046968 - METHOD OF PREPARING POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR, AND POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, POSITIVE ELECTRODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY WHICH ARE PREPARED BY USING THE PRECURSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/34] | METHOD FOR PREPARING CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR, CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PREPARED USING SAME, CATHODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | ||
[2024/17] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/32] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Lg Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyun Uk LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Eung Ju LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Woo Hyun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Sang Soon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Jun Gil LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
YOO, Gyeong Il LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 21770815.5 | 22.03.2021 | [2022/34] | WO2021KR03526 | Priority number, date | KR20200034381 | 20.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200034381 | [2022/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187963 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046968 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4046968 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/00, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M4/131, H01M10/052, // H01M10/0525, H01M4/02 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
C01G53/50 (EP);
C01G53/04 (KR);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
C01G53/006 (EP);
C01G53/44 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/50 (US);
C01P2002/60 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/45 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (KR);
C01P2006/11 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | C01G53/00, H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M10/052, H01M10/0525 | ||
Former IPC [2022/34] | C01G53/04, H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POSITIVEN ELEKTRODEN-AKTIVMATERIALVORLÄUFERS FÜR EINE LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, POSITIV-ELEKTRODEN-AKTIVMATERIALVORLÄUFER, UND POSITIV-ELEKTRODEN-AKTIVMATERIAL, POSITIVE ELEKTRODE, UND LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE HERGESTELLT DURCH VERWENDUNG DES VORLÄUFERS | [2024/17] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR, AND POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, POSITIVE ELECTRODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY WHICH ARE PREPARED BY USING THE PRECURSOR | [2024/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN PRÉCURSEUR DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, PRÉCURSEUR DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, ET MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM PRÉPARÉS EN UTILISANT LEDIT PRÉCURSEUR | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/34] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATHODENAKTIVMATERIALVORLÄUFERS FÜR LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, KATHODEN-KTIVMATERIALVORLÄUFER, DAMIT HERGESTELLTES KATHODENAKTIVMATERIAL, KATHODE UND LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | ||
Former [2022/34] | METHOD FOR PREPARING CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR, CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PREPARED USING SAME, CATHODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | ||
Former [2022/34] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN PRÉCURSEUR DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, PRÉCURSEUR DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE, MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE PRÉPARÉ À L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI, CATHODE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | Translation filed | 19.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3425706 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20190113607 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]); | [X]CN110422889 (DANGSHENG TECH CHANGZHOU NEW MATERIAL CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2015076154 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]KR20180063862 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20190046678 (KOREA NATIONAL UNIV OF TRANSPORTATION INDUSTRY ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR]); | [A]KR20200001082 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2020035693 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) | by applicant | KR20200034381 |