EP4123075 - CLOTHING TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Changoh IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Woore IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
HONG, Sangwook IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21771229.8 | 16.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021KR03250 | Priority number, date | KR20200032176 | 16.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200032176 | [2023/04] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187872 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123075 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/46, D06F33/48, H05B6/10, D06F33/36, D06F33/34, // D06F25/00, D06F39/08, D06F33/44, D06F103/04, D06F103/18, D06F105/02, D06F105/10, D06F105/28, D06F39/04, H05B6/06 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
D06F33/34 (EP);
D06F33/46 (EP,KR);
D06F33/36 (EP);
D06F33/44 (EP,KR);
D06F33/48 (KR);
D06F34/16 (KR);
D06F34/24 (KR);
D06F39/04 (EP,KR);
D06F39/085 (KR);
D06F39/087 (KR);
D06F39/088 (KR);
H05B6/06 (EP);
H05B6/10 (EP,KR);
D06F2103/04 (EP);
D06F2103/18 (EP);
D06F2105/02 (EP);
D06F2105/28 (EP);
D06F25/00 (EP);
D06F39/083 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | D06F33/46, D06F33/44, D06F33/48, D06F39/04, D06F39/08, D06F34/16, D06F34/24, H05B6/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KLEIDUNG | [2023/04] | English: | CLOTHING TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2023/04] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE VÊTEMENTS | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2022 | Translation filed | 13.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2019164244 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * see annotated machine translation * * figures 2-12 *[A] 3,5-7,10; | [XP]EP3640389 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [XP] 1,2,5,8,9 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0172] - paragraph [0173] * * figures 2-9 * | International search | [A]KR20060089072 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0005]-[0095]; and figures 1-6. *; | [A]US2014109429 (WEHRHEIM ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0025]; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2018148886 (KALZE OLIVER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* See claims 1-2; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20190016863 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0044]-[0061]; claim 1; and figures 1-2. *; | [X]KR20190101266 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0004], [0020], [0034]-[0035], [0038], [0098]-[0099], [0111] and [0114]-[0115]; and figures 1-2 and 5. * | by applicant | KR20190016859 |