EP3961554 - AUTOMATIC DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD FOR ROLLER SURFACE OF ROLLER PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNBM (Hefei) Powder Technology Equipment Co., Ltd. No.12, Chuangyeyuan Road Baohe Industrial Hefei Anhui 230051 / CN | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Qianqian No.60 Wangjiang East Road Hefei, Anhui 230002 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Zhiling No.60 Wangjiang East Road Hefei, Anhui 230002 / CN | 03 /
XU, Ruikang No.60 Wangjiang East Road Hefei, Anhui 230002 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Lin No.60 Wangjiang East Road Hefei, Anhui 230002 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Wenjin No.60 Wangjiang East Road Hefei, Anhui 230002 / CN | 06 /
CHEN, Zhonghua No.60 Wangjiang East Road Hefei, Anhui 230002 / CN | 07 /
HUANG, He No.60 Wangjiang East Road Hefei, Anhui 230002 / CN | 08 /
WU, Xianbin No.60 Wangjiang East Road Hefei, Anhui 230002 / CN | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21771646.3 | 08.02.2021 | [2022/09] | WO2021CN76080 | Priority number, date | CN202010203566 | 20.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010203566 | [2022/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185009 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961554 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/952, G01N21/88, G06T7/00 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G01N21/952 (EP);
G01N21/8851 (EP,CN);
G01N21/01 (CN);
G01N21/8901 (CN);
G01N21/892 (CN);
G06T17/00 (CN);
G06T7/0004 (EP,CN);
G06T7/80 (CN);
G01N2021/8854 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE WALZENOBERFLÄCHE EINER WALZENPRESSE | [2022/09] | English: | AUTOMATIC DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD FOR ROLLER SURFACE OF ROLLER PRESS | [2022/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION AUTOMATIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION POUR SURFACE DE ROULEAU D'UNE PRESSE À ROULEAUX | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2021 | Translation filed | 10.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 22.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN106814072 (KUNSHAN HIECISE HEAVY-DUTY MACHINES CO LTD); | [A]WO2018204205 (STAFAST PRODUCTS INC [US]); | [X]CN110288545 (SHENZHEN ESSTK TECH CO LTD); | [X]CN110660093 (UNIV SHANGHAI ENG SCIENCE); | [A]CN110653341 (KOCEL INTELLIGENT FOUNDRY IND INNOVATION CT CO LTD); | [PX]CN111239144 (CNBM HEFEI POWDER TECH EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [PX]CN212008354U (CNBM HEFEI POWDER TECH EQUIPMENT CO LTD) | by applicant | CN110288545 |