EP4123025 - HEAT RESISTANT MISMATCH ENDONUCLEASE VARIANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takara Bio Inc. 4-38, Nojihigashi 7-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-0058 / JP | For all designated states Educational Corporation Kansai Bunri Sougougakuen 1266 Tamura-cho Nagahama-shi, Shiga 526-0829 / JP | For all designated states Kyushu University, National University Corporation 744, Motooka Nishi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 819-0395 / JP | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Hiroyuki c/o TAKARA BIO INC., 4-38, Nojihigashi 7-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0058 / JP | 02 /
UEMORI, Takashi c/o TAKARA BIO INC., 4-38, Nojihigashi 7-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0058 / JP | 03 /
SHIRAI, Tsuyoshi c/o EDUCATIONAL CORPORATION KANSAI BUNRI SOUGOUGAKUEN, 1266, Tamura-cho Nagahama-shi, Shiga 526-0829 / JP | 04 /
ISHINO, Yoshizumi c/o KYUSHU UNIVERSITY, NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION, 744, Motooka, Nishi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 819-0395 / JP | 05 /
ISHINO, Sonoko c/o KYUSHU UNIVERSITY, NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION, 744, Motooka, Nishi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 819-0395 / JP | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21772153.9 | 18.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021JP11033 | Priority number, date | JP20200048795 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020048795 | [2023/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187554 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123025 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N9/14, C12N15/63, C12Q1/6844, C12Q1/686 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP);
C12N15/52 (US);
C12N15/63 (US);
C12N9/22 (EP);
C12Q1/6844 (EP);
C07K2319/21 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2521/101, C12Q2521/301, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2537/143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | HITZEBESTÄNDIGE FEHLPAARUNGSENDONUKLEASEVARIANTE | [2023/04] | English: | HEAT RESISTANT MISMATCH ENDONUCLEASE VARIANT | [2023/04] | French: | VARIANT D'ENDONUCLÉASE DE MÉSAPPARIEMENT RÉSISTANT À LA CHALEUR | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2022 | Translation filed | 20.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2975124 (TAKARA BIO INC [JP]) [A] 1-17 * example 5; sequences 1-2 *; | [A] - SONOKO ISHINO ET AL, "Identification of a mismatch-specific endonuclease in hyperthermophilic Archaea", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, GB, (20160321), vol. 44, no. 7, doi:10.1093/nar/gkw153, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2977 - 2986, XP055311909 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkw153 | International search | [A]WO2016039377 (TAKARA BIO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract, claims 1-10, paragraphs [0001], [0016]-[0028], [0036], [0037], examples 1-6 *; | [A]JP6009649B (TAKARA BIO INC.) [A] 1-17 * abstract, claims 1-13, paragraphs [0001], [0014]-[0019], [0024], examples 1-6 *; | [A] - REN, B. et al., "Structure and function of a novel endonuclease acting on branched DNA substrates", The EMBO journal, (20090716), vol. 28, no. 16, doi:10.1038/emboj.2009.192, pages 2479 - 2489, XP055395578 [A] 1-17 * abstract, page 2485, left column, page 2486, left column, fig. 4, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/emboj.2009.192 | by applicant | US5922539 | WO0162974 | WO2014142261 | WO2016039377 | WO2016152812 | - Nucleic Acids Research, (20040200), vol. 32, no. 3, page e37 | - Methods in Molecular Biology, (20090000), vol. 496, no. 2, pages 223 - 243 | - American Journal of Pathology, (19980800), vol. 153, no. 2, pages 373 - 379 |