EP4120960 - LENS PROVIDING BOTH POSITIVE AND NEGATIVE DIFFRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roop, Prakhyat c/o Dr. Roop 348 Govind Lok E.K. Road Meerut, Uttar Pradesh 250001 / IN | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21772503.5 | 18.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021IB52263 | Priority number, date | IN202011012107 | 20.03.2020 Original published format: IN202011012107 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021186378 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120960 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16, G02B3/08, G02B3/10, G02C7/04, G02C7/02 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G02C7/044 (EP,US);
A61F2/1618 (EP,US);
A61F2/1654 (EP,US);
G02C7/024 (EP);
G02C7/042 (EP);
G02C2202/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | LINSE ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON POSITIVER UND NEGATIVER BEUGUNG | [2023/04] | English: | LENS PROVIDING BOTH POSITIVE AND NEGATIVE DIFFRACTION | [2023/04] | French: | LENTILLE FOURNISSANT À LA FOIS UNE DIFFRACTION POSITIVE ET UNE DIFFRACTION NÉGATIVE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5089023 (SWANSON GARY J [US]) [A] 13* figures 4, 6 *; | [XY]EP0681198 (COHEN ALLEN L DR [US]) [X] 1,11 * figures 7, 12 * [Y] 2-13; | [XY]US5760871 (KOSOBURD TATIANA [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * figure 7 * [Y] 2,12; | [Y]US2007258143 (PORTNEY VALDEMAR [US]) [Y] 4,5 * figure 7 *; | [XY]US2013201445 (DAS KAMAL K [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,12,13 * figures 1C, 2 * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]US2017108711 (MUSCHIELOK ADAM [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * figures 4A, 4B * * paragraphs [0147] , [ 148] *; | [XA]EP3435143 (VSY BIYOTEKNOLOJI VE ILAC SANAYI ANONIM SIRKETI [TR]) [X] 1 * figure 7a * [A] 2-13 | International search | [A]US4637697 (FREEMAN MICHAEL H [GB]) [A] 1-7, 9, 11, 13, 15, 17,19-22, 27-29 * ; column 7, lines 1-20 *; | [YA]US2005264757 (MORRIS G M [US], et al) [Y] 3-6 * ; figure 7; paragraph [0029] * [A] 17, 19-22; | [Y]US2006098162 (BANDHAUER MARK H [US], et al) [Y] 27-29 * ; figure 5; paragraphs [0083], [0091], [0092] *; | [A]US2010131060 (SIMPSON MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-7, 9, 11, 13, 15, 17,19-22, 27-29 * ; figure 2C; paragraph [0036] *; | [A]US8992611 (ZHAO HUAWEI [US]) [A] 1-7, 9, 11, 13, 15, 17,19-22, 27-29 * ; see entire document *; | [A]US2019025474 (PETERSEN JOEL MIKAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-7, 9, 11, 13, 15, 17,19-22, 27-29* ; see entire document *; | [XYA]US2019307556 (SARVER EDWIN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,11,13,15 * ; figure 9; paragraphs [0050], [0052] * [Y] 3-6,27-29 [A] 17, 19-22 |