EP4123697 - INSULATED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURAI, Akira c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute 600, Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | 02 /
TERASAKI, Nobuyuki c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute 600, Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21772541.5 | 16.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021JP10548 | Priority number, date | JP20200047956 | 18.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020047956 | JP20210040435 | 12.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021040435 | [2023/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187464 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123697 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C04B37/02, H01L23/13, H01L23/12, H01L23/36, H01L23/373 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
C04B37/026 (EP);
H01L23/49838 (KR);
H05K3/0061 (US);
H01L23/15 (EP,KR);
H01L23/36 (KR);
H01L23/49805 (KR);
H01L23/49866 (EP,KR);
H05K1/0204 (US);
C04B2237/124 (EP);
C04B2237/343 (EP);
C04B2237/366 (EP);
C04B2237/368 (EP);
C04B2237/402 (EP);
C04B2237/58 (EP);
C04B2237/60 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | H01L23/13, H01L23/12, H01L23/36, H01L23/373 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE LEITERPLATTE | [2023/04] | English: | INSULATED CIRCUIT BOARD | [2023/04] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT ISOLÉE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | Translation filed | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 03.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2296177 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]); | [X]WO2013024813 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al); | [X]US2014192486 (KUROMITSU YOSHIROU [JP], et al); | [A]US9735085 (TERASAKI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) | International search | [XA]JP2012059836 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [XA]WO2013024813 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2019146464 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP3171234B | JP5359953B | JP2020047956 | JP2021040435 |