EP4024600 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR HAVING CONDUCTIVE ANTI-CORROSION LAYER FORMED ON TAB, POSITIVE ELECTRODE COMPRISING SAME, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Hyunwoong LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Sunwook LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
HAH, Hoejin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21772555.5 | 20.01.2021 | [2022/27] | WO2021KR95008 | Priority number, date | KR20200034072 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200034072 | KR20210002734 | 08.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210002734 | [2022/27] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187965 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024600 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/571, H01M50/531, H01M4/66, H01M10/052, H01M4/13, H01M4/02 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H01M4/667 (EP,CN);
H01M4/628 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M10/0565 (EP);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (CN);
H01M4/623 (US);
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
H01M4/663 (EP);
H01M4/668 (EP);
H01M50/534 (CN);
H01M50/571 (CN);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENSTROMABNEHMER MIT LEITFÄHIGER KORROSIONSSCHUTZSCHICHT AUF DER LASCHE, POSITIVELEKTRODE DAMIT UND LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/27] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR HAVING CONDUCTIVE ANTI-CORROSION LAYER FORMED ON TAB, POSITIVE ELECTRODE COMPRISING SAME, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/27] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE COURANT D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE AYANT UNE COUCHE ANTI-CORROSION CONDUCTRICE FORMÉE SUR UNE LANGUETTE, ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE LE COMPRENANT ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2022 | Translation filed | 28.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 29.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02139852 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [XYI]EP2482368 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [Y]KR101737217B ; | [X]CN107482155 (HUNAN MIAOCHONG NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD) | International search | [Y]JP2010074083 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [Y] 6 * See paragraph [0020]. *; | [XY]JP2012178326 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-5,7-12 * See paragraphs [0054]-[0073] and figure 1. * [Y] 6,13-15; | [Y]KR20160038361 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 13-15 * See paragraph [0003] and claims 7-9 and 11-12. *; | [A]KR20160051001 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See figures 3-5. *; | [A]KR20180058333 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0070]-[0080]. * | by applicant | DE102009001812 |