EP4210992 - CHARGING POST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states me energy GmbH Schmiedestraße 2 15745 Wildau / DE | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOHL, Alexander 12437 Berlin / DE | 02 /
ADLER, Inès 10783 Berlin / DE | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Dirk Dantz IP & Law Kurfürstendamm 43 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/29] | Dantz, Dirk dantzhoehne. PATENT & RECHT Kurfürstendamm 43 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 21773083.7 | 06.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021EP74511 | Priority number, date | DE202010123801 | 11.09.2020 Original published format: DE102020123801 | [2023/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053437 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210992 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/30, B60L53/50, B60L53/53, B60L53/52, B60L53/51, B60L53/54, B60L53/63, B60L53/64, B60L53/68, B60L55/00, B60L58/12, H02J7/14, H02J3/28, H02J3/30, H02J3/32, H02J3/38 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B60L53/305 (EP,US);
B60L53/63 (EP,US);
B60L53/32 (EP);
B60L53/50 (EP,US);
B60L53/51 (EP);
B60L53/52 (EP);
B60L53/53 (EP);
B60L53/54 (EP);
B60L53/64 (EP);
B60L53/68 (EP);
B60L55/00 (EP);
B60L58/12 (EP);
H02J3/322 (EP);
H02J7/00712 (EP);
B60L2240/70 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP);
Y02T90/167 (EP);
Y04S10/126 (EP);
Y04S30/12 (EP);
Y04S30/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | LADESÄULE | [2023/29] | English: | CHARGING POST | [2023/29] | French: | BORNE DE CHARGE | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 11.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102010015758 (ELEKTRYON UG HAFTUNGSBESCHRAEKT [DE]) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] - [0089]; figures 1-14; claim 2 *; | [X]US2012249065 (BISSONETTE MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0047] - [0048]; figures 1-20 *; | [X]US2018110150 (BLANCHET PIERRE [CA], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0048]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2019366868 (TSENG LING-YUAN [TW]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0031] , [0053] , [0071] , [0074] , [0076] , [0080] - [0083] - [0090]; figures 1-16 *; | [X]US2020164755 (SMOLENAERS STEFAN [AU]) [X] 1-23* paragraphs [137.172] - [0192] - [0277] - [0285] - [0374] , [0375] , [0412] - [0417]; figures 1-16 * | by applicant | DE102009016505 |