EP4213982 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR DELIVERING FEEDSTOCKS FOR PLASMA TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haydale Graphene Industries plc Clos Fferws Parc Hendre Capel Hendre Ammanford Carmarthenshire SA18 3BL / GB | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEYMOUR, John-Mark South Wales SA18 3BL / GB | 02 /
HOWE, Thomas South Wales SA18 3BL / GB | 03 /
EDWARDS, Lee South Wales SA18 3BL / GB | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21773102.5 | 08.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021EP74727 | Priority number, date | GB20200014776 | 18.09.2020 Original published format: GB 202014776 | GB20200014779 | 18.09.2020 Original published format: GB 202014779 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022058218 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213982 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/08, B01J19/28, B01J4/02, H01J37/32 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
B01J19/088 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/0013 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/28 (EP,KR);
B01J4/02 (EP);
C01B21/0648 (US);
C01B32/174 (US);
C01B32/194 (US);
C01B32/198 (US);
C01B32/21 (US);
H01J37/32018 (US);
H01J37/32036 (US);
H01J37/32082 (EP,KR);
H01J37/32477 (US);
H01J37/32522 (US);
H01J37/32944 (US);
B01J2219/00076 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00094 (EP);
B01J2219/00162 (US);
B01J2219/00186 (US);
B01J2219/00355 (US);
B01J2219/00488 (US);
B01J2219/0801 (EP);
B01J2219/0809 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/0815 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/0818 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/0847 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/0869 (EP);
B01J2219/0871 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0879 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0894 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/0896 (US);
B01J2219/0898 (US);
C01B2202/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE VON EINSATZSTOFFEN ZUR PLASMABEHANDLUNG | [2023/30] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR DELIVERING FEEDSTOCKS FOR PLASMA TREATMENT | [2023/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR DISTRIBUER DES CHARGES POUR UN TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 11.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 16.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4881722 (KOIZUMI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,16,18,22 * abstract * * column 3, lines 66-68 * [I] 2-8,10-15,17,19-21,23-25; | [A]US2001050056 (FRANCE PAUL AMAAT [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [A]US2005214535 (DENES FERENCZ S [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [[0036]] *; | [XI]US2007125998 (BUNCE TIMOTHY R [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,20-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035], [0057], [0086], [0087], [0090], [0096] * [I] 3-6,9-19,23-25; | [A]WO2019040857 (FORGE NANO INC [US]) [A] 1-25* figures 1, 2, 3 * | by applicant | WO2010142953 | WO2012076853 | WO2015145172 |