EP4196713 - FLUID CONDUIT FOR AIRCRAFT, COMPRISING A THERMOPLASTIC PIPE AND A CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Atlantic Zone Industrielle de l'Ancien Arsenal 17300 Rochefort / FR | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERHERIN, Daniel 44600 SAINT-NAZAIRE / FR | 02 /
BOULZE, Daniel 31840 AUSSONNE / FR | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Argyma 14 Boulevard de Strasbourg 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21773621.4 | 14.09.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021EP75150 | Priority number, date | FR20200010157 | 05.10.2020 Original published format: FR 2010157 | [2023/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022073723 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4196713 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4196713 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/22 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
F16L47/22 (EP);
B29C63/346 (US);
B29C57/005 (US);
F16L37/084 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDLEITUNG FÜR LUFTFAHRZEUG, UMFASSEND EIN THERMOPLASTISCHES ROHR UND EINEN STECKVERBINDER | [2023/25] | English: | FLUID CONDUIT FOR AIRCRAFT, COMPRISING A THERMOPLASTIC PIPE AND A CONNECTOR | [2023/25] | French: | CONDUITE DE FLUIDE POUR AÉRONEF COMPRENANT UNE CANALISATION THERMOPLASTIQUE ET UN CONNECTEUR | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 16.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0530387 (WIRSBO ROHRPROD UND VERTR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 3 - column 5; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO9919658 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 6, line 9; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP3628907 (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0034]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0530387 | WO9919658 | EP3628907 |