EP4217354 - PYRAZOLYL-PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | 24.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur, 10 20014 Nerviano (MI) / IT | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BINDI, Simona 20154 Milan / IT | 02 /
BUFFA, Laura 16010 Rossiglione (GE) / IT | 03 /
CERVI, Giovanni 22100 Como / IT | 04 /
D ALESSIO, Roberto 20092 Cinisello Balsamo (MI) / IT | 05 /
MENICHINCHERI, Maria 20124 Milan / IT | 06 /
MODUGNO, Michele 20015 Parabiago (Milan) / IT | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21773829.3 | 15.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021EP75297 | Priority number, date | EP20200197710 | 23.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20197710 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063646 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4217354 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04, C07D403/14, A61P35/00, A61K31/415, A61K31/506 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (US);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | PYRAZOLYLPYRIMIDINDERIVATE ALS KINASEHEMMER | [2023/31] | English: | PYRAZOLYL-PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS KINASE INHIBITORS | [2023/31] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRAZOLYL-PYRIMIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE KINASE | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012139930 (NERVIANO MEDICAL SCIENCES SRL [IT], et al); | by applicant | WO2012139930 | US2020239458 | WO2020172431 |