EP4130937 - MOTION-DETECTING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINTEC CORPORATION 23-23 Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIHARA, Yoshiaki c/o LINTEC CORPORATION 23-23 Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21774079.4 | 17.02.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP05998 | Priority number, date | JP20200053218 | 24.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020053218 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021192748 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130937 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, A61B5/11 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G06F3/014 (EP,KR,US);
G01B7/18 (US);
A61B5/11 (EP,KR);
A61B5/6806 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSDETEKTIONSELEMENT | [2023/06] | English: | MOTION-DETECTING MEMBER | [2023/06] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE DÉTECTION DE MOUVEMENT | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2022 | Translation filed | 07.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018347081 (KURAHASHI TAKAOMI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2000112640 (ELECTROTEXTILES CO LTD); | [A]JP2011047702 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN); | [A]US2013082922 (MILLER SAMUEL A [US]); | [X]WO2018037855 (GUNZE KK [JP]) | by applicant | JP2011253140 | US2013251619 | JP2016130940 | JP2017061770 | JP2020053218 |