EP4129938 - WINDSHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOMURA, Takahiro c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited, 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 02 /
ANDO, Kenshu c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited, 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 03 /
HOTTA, Hirofumi c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited, 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21774146.1 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP13429 | Priority number, date | JP20200059215 | 27.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020059215 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021193979 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4129938 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C03B27/012, C03C27/12, B60J1/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C03B23/0252 (EP);
B60J1/00 (US);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B17/10036 (EP);
B32B17/10064 (US);
B32B17/10091 (EP);
B32B17/10137 (EP);
B32B17/10348 (EP);
B32B17/1066 (EP);
B32B17/10761 (EP);
B32B17/10788 (EP);
B32B17/10816 (US);
B32B7/022 (EP);
C03B23/03 (EP);
C03B25/025 (EP);
C03B25/08 (EP);
C03B27/0413 (EP);
C03B27/0442 (EP);
C03C21/002 (EP);
C03C21/007 (EP);
C03C27/10 (EP);
C03C3/087 (EP);
B32B17/10119 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2307/102 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7376 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | WINDSCHUTZSCHEIBE | [2023/06] | English: | WINDSHIELD | [2023/06] | French: | PARE-BRISE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | Translation filed | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012094084 (FISHER WILLIAM KEITH [US], et al); | [X]US2015251377 (CLEARY THOMAS MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2016207290 (CLEARY THOMAS MICHAEL [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH1160294 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 10-11* paragraph [0003] *; | [XY]JP2015525193 (CORNING INCORPORATED) [X] 1-9 * claims 1, 4, paragraphs [0006]-[0008], [0018]-[0023], [0092], fig. 1-3 paragraphs [0085]-[0086] * [Y] 10-11; | [Y]JP2019119631 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 10-11 * paragraphs [0069], [0076] * | by applicant | JP2016064965 |