EP4128117 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OFFERING CARBON OFFSET REWARDS THAT CORRESPOND TO USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blueowl, LLC 1 Sansome Street San Francisco CA 94104 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANCHEZ, Kenneth Jason 2210 Stockton Street, Apt. 3051 San Francisco, California 94133 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21774793.0 | 23.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US23555 | Priority number, date | US202063000874P | 27.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063000874 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021195006 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128117 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/147, G06Q20/00, G06F16/958, G06N3/08, G06Q10/00, G06Q30/0241, G06Q30/0251, G07C5/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/147 (EP);
G06Q30/018 (US);
B60W40/09 (US);
G01C21/3469 (US);
G01C21/3617 (US);
G05D21/00 (US);
G06E3/001 (US);
G06F16/958 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06G7/70 (US);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06Q10/00 (EP);
G06Q30/0201 (US);
G06Q30/0208 (US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP);
G06Q30/0255 (EP);
G06Q30/0277 (EP);
G06Q30/0284 (US);
G06Q30/0641 (US);
G06Q40/08 (US);
G06Q50/40 (US);
G06T11/00 (US);
G06T7/0002 (US);
G06V20/188 (US);
G07C5/0841 (US);
G16Z99/00 (US);
B60W2540/30 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANBIETEN VON BENUTZER ENTSPRECHENDEN KOHLENSTOFFOFFSETBELOHNUNGEN | [2023/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OFFERING CARBON OFFSET REWARDS THAT CORRESPOND TO USERS | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR OFFRIR DES RÉCOMPENSES SOUS FORME DE COMPENSATION CARBONE QUI CORRESPONDENT À DES UTILISATEURS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 05.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009210295 (EDHOLM YORGEN [US], et al); | [A]US2011093321 (STREETMAN FOY [US]); | [I]US2017351978 (BELLOWE GREGORY M [US]); | [I]US2018285885 (LABERTEAUX KEN [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2005154669 (STREETMAN FOY [US]); | [Y]US2013218427 (MUKHOPADHYAY JAYDIP [IN], et al); | [Y]US2015371251 (LIMBASIA SUNIL [US], et al); | [Y]US2016232550 (FLETCHER PAUL [AU], et al); | [Y]US2019213097 (JIN HUAJING [CN], et al); | [Y]US2020027102 (XU JIN [US], et al) |