EP4130343 - TITANIUM SUBSTRATE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING TITANIUM SUBSTRATE, ELECTRODE FOR WATER ELECTROLYSIS, AND WATER ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANO Yosuke c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute, 600, Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | 02 /
OHMORI Shinichi c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute, 600, Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21774945.6 | 25.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP12678 | Priority number, date | JP20200056277 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020056277 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021193857 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130343 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/055, C01G23/04, C25B9/00, C25B11/03 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B11/063 (EP,US);
C25B11/02 (EP);
C25B11/031 (EP,US);
C25B11/052 (EP);
C25B11/077 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | TITANSUBSTRAT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TITANSUBSTRATS, ELEKTRODE FÜR WASSERELEKTROLYSE UND WASSERELEKTROLYSEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/06] | English: | TITANIUM SUBSTRATE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING TITANIUM SUBSTRATE, ELECTRODE FOR WATER ELECTROLYSIS, AND WATER ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE | [2023/06] | French: | SUBSTRAT EN TITANE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRAT EN TITANE, ÉLECTRODE POUR ÉLECTROLYSE DE L'EAU ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉLECTROLYSE DE L'EAU | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | Translation filed | 22.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2018139613 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0057] *; | [Y]JP2019143235 (ASAHI KASEI CORP, et al) [Y] 1-8* paragraphs [0039]-[0041], [0044] *; | [Y]JP2019157273 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0009], [0011]-[0013], [0015], [0038], [0049], [0073] * | by applicant | JP2003082405 | JP2003226992 | JP2006138005 | JP2010135316 | JP2010236083 | JP5831670B | JP2019157273 | JP2020056277 |