EP4125992 - PROTEIN KINASE C MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Young Therapeutics, LLC 1715 Stanwood Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19152 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Lindon 1715 Stanwood Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19152 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21774985.2 | 24.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US23943 | Priority number, date | US202062994098P | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062994098 P | US202063017488P | 29.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063017488 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021195254 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125992 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, C07K14/47, C12N9/96, A61K38/10 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
A01N1/0226 (EP,US);
C07K14/4705 (US);
C07K2319/033 (EP,US);
C07K2319/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | A61K38/10, C07K19/00, C12N9/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | PROTEINKINASE-C-MODULATOREN | [2023/06] | English: | PROTEIN KINASE C MODULATORS | [2023/06] | French: | MODULATEURS DE PROTÉINE KINASE C | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 29.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2006160062 (YOUNG LINDON H [US]); | [A]WO2012031296 (PHILADELPHIA COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE [US], et al); | International search | [Y]WO9929721 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al); | [Y]US2002168354 (MOCHLY-ROSEN DARIA [US]); | [XY]US2010311671 (JOHNSON RANDOLPH MELLUS [US], et al); | [Y]US2016279255 (WILSON D TRAVIS [US]) | by applicant | US2006160062 | US2007148628 | US2008311553 | WO2012031296 | US2012141973 | US2014220549 | US2016302406 |