EP4127702 - COMPRESSIVE SENSING FOR FULL MATRIX CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evident Canada, Inc. 3415 Rue Pierre-Ardouin Québec, QC G1P0B3 / CA | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE DUFF, Alain 83, 8, rue Saint Louis Quebec, Québec G1P 0B3 / CA | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Noack, Andreas c/o Stolmár & Partner Neuer Wall 71 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21776104.8 | 17.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021CA50354 | Priority number, date | US202062993849P | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062993849 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021189130 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127702 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/44, G01N29/04, G01S15/89, G01S7/52, G01N29/06 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G01S7/52025 (EP);
G10L19/022 (US);
G01N29/043 (EP);
G01N29/0654 (EP);
G01N29/2437 (EP);
G01N29/262 (EP);
G01N29/28 (EP);
G01N29/44 (EP);
G01N29/4472 (EP);
G01S15/8915 (EP);
G01S7/52034 (EP);
G01S7/52046 (EP);
G01N2291/106 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | G01N29/44, G01N29/04, G01S15/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | KOMPRIMIERENDE ERFASSUNG FÜR VOLLMATRIXERFASSUNG | [2023/06] | English: | COMPRESSIVE SENSING FOR FULL MATRIX CAPTURE | [2023/06] | French: | DÉTECTION DE COMPRESSION POUR CAPTURE DE MATRICE COMPLÈTE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 02.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2019162485 (UNIV LEUVEN KATH [BE]) [X] 1-4,8-12 * abstract * * page 5, line 11 - page 14, line 19 * [Y] 5-7,13-15; | [X]US2019336107 (HOPE SIMPSON DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0049] *; | [Y] - STEWART A GREENHALGH ET AL, "Solutions, algorithms and inter-relations for local minimization search geophysical inversion; Solutions for geophysical inversion", JOURNAL OF GEOPHYSICS AND ENGINEERING, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20060601), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1088/1742-2132/3/2/001, ISSN 1742-2140, pages 101 - 113, XP020108877 [Y] 5-7,13-15 * abstract * * page 105, column r, paragraph l - page 107, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1742-2132/3/2/001 | [Y] - BING ZHOU ET AL, "Iterative Algorithm For the Damped Minimum Norm, Least-squares And Constrained Problem In Seismic Tomography", EXPLORATION GEOPHYSICS, AU, vol. 23, no. 3, doi:10.1071/EG992497, ISSN 0812-3985, (20150831), pages 497 - 505, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Bing-Zhou-6/publication/248903244_Iterative_Algorithm_For_the_Damped_Minimum_Norm_Least-squares_And_Constrained_Problem_In_Seismic_Tomography/links/55e3f31808ae2fac47213bbc/Iterative-Algorithm-For-the-Damped-Minimum-Norm-Least-squares-And-Constrained-Problem-In-S, (20240219), XP093132869 [Y] 5-7,13-15 * abstract * * page 498, column l, paragraph l - page 504, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1071/EG992497 | International search | [XA]WO2019166332 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3, 8-10, 14-16 * Abstract; paragraphs [004]-[010], [023], [029], [030] *[A] 4-7, 11-13, 17-20 |