EP4129655 - EXPANDABLE ADHESIVE SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 25.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya Kagacho 1-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Shinya c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1, Ichigaya- kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
HOSHI, Kentaro c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1, Ichigaya- kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
SEGAWA, Toshikazu c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1, Ichigaya- kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21776778.9 | 25.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP12647 | Priority number, date | JP20200054472 | 25.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020054472 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021193848 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4129655 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, C09J5/08, C09J201/00, C09J7/30, B29C44/12, B32B37/12, C08K9/10 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
C09J5/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/12 (EP,KR);
B32B7/12 (KR);
C09J201/00 (KR);
C09J7/29 (US);
C09J7/30 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/50 (KR,US);
B29C44/1228 (EP);
B32B2037/1253 (EP);
C08K9/10 (EP);
C09J2301/312 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2301/408 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | B32B27/00, C09J5/08, C09J201/00, C09J7/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | EXPANDIERBARE KLEBEFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARTIKELS | [2023/06] | English: | EXPANDABLE ADHESIVE SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ARTICLE | [2023/06] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE EXPANSIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ARTICLE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | Translation filed | 22.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 23.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010028588 (KIUCHI KAZUYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12-14* examples 1,2; claims 1-16 *; | [XAI]US2018134926 (LEI MING [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0041] , [0087] - [0184]; claims 1-28 * [A] 3,4 [I] 2,12; | [XAI]WO2019030914 (TERAOKA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1,5-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; examples 1-10; claims 1-13 * [A] 3,4 [I] 2,12; | [XAI]WO2019226819 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,5-11,13,14 * claims 1-10; tables 1A,1B * [A] 2-4 [I] 12 | International search | [A]JP2010138220 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-14 * entire text *; | [A]WO2016163514 (TERAOKA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * entire text *; | [A]WO2019030914 (TERAOKA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * entire text *; | [A]JP2019203062 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO) [A] 1-14 * entire text *; | [PA]JP2020125410 (NITTOSHINKO CORP) [PA] 1-14* claims, examples, paragraph [0063] * | by applicant | JP2014065889 | WO2016163514 | JP2019203062 | - Physical and Chemical Science Dictionary, WILEY INTERSCIENCE |