EP4210742 - BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY AGAINST CD3 AND CD20 IN COMBINATION THERAPY FOR TREATING FOLLICULAR LYMPHOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genmab A/S Carl Jacobsens Vej 30 2500 Valby / DK | [2023/42] |
Former [2023/29] | For all designated states Genmab A/S Kalvebod Brygge 43 1560 Copenhagen V / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIOTT, Brian Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 02 /
AHMADI, Tahamtan Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 03 /
CHIU, Christopher Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 04 /
BREIJ, Esther C. W. 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 05 /
HIEMSTRA, Ida 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 06 /
JURE-KUNKEL, Maria N. Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Genmab A/S Carl Jacobsens Vej 30 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21777653.3 | 10.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021EP75017 | Priority number, date | US202063076740P | 10.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063076740 P | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053655 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210742 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/02, C07K16/28, A61K39/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/454 (IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (US);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/2809 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/468 (US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/545 (KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (IL,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Extension states | BA | 04.04.2023 | ME | 04.04.2023 | Validation states | KH | 04.04.2023 | MA | 04.04.2023 | MD | 04.04.2023 | TN | 04.04.2023 | Title | German: | BISPEZIFISCHER ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN CD3 UND CD20 IN EINER KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FOLLIKELLYMPHOM | [2023/29] | English: | BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY AGAINST CD3 AND CD20 IN COMBINATION THERAPY FOR TREATING FOLLICULAR LYMPHOMA | [2023/29] | French: | ANTICORPS BISPÉCIFIQUE CONTRE CD3 ET CD20 EN POLYTHÉRAPIE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN LYMPHOME FOLLICULAIRE | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016110576 (GENMAB AS [DK]) [A] 1-48* the whole document *; | [A] - MORSCHHAUSER FRANCK ET AL, "Rituximab plus Lenalidomide in Advanced Untreated Follicular Lymphoma", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, US, (20180906), vol. 379, no. 10, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1805104, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 934 - 947, XP055855089 [A] 1-48 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1805104 | [AD] - PATRICK J. ENGELBERTS ET AL, "DuoBody-CD3xCD20 induces potent T-cell-mediated killing of malignant B cells in preclinical models and provides opportunities for subcutaneous dosing", EBIOMEDICINE, NL, (20200201), vol. 52, doi:10.1016/j.ebiom.2019.102625, ISSN 2352-3964, page 102625, XP055762370 [AD] 1-48 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ebiom.2019.102625 | [AD] - VAN DER HORST HILMA J ET AL, "Duobody-CD3xCD20 Induces Potent Anti-Tumor Activity in Malignant Lymph Node B Cells from Patients with DLBCL, FL and MCL Ex Vivo, Irrespective of Prior Treatment with CD20 Monoclonal Antibodies", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20191113), vol. 134, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2019-125765, ISSN 0006-4971, page 4066, XP086675260 [AD] 1-48 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2019-125765 | by applicant | WO9222653 | EP0629240 | US5736137 | WO9850431 | WO2004035607 | WO2007059782 | EP1870459 | WO2009089004 | WO2010129304 | WO2011117329 | WO2011131746 | WO2013060867 | WO2015001085 | WO2016110576 | WO2019155008 | - RELANDER et al., J Clin Oncol, (20100000), vol. 28, pages 2902 - 13 | - WAGNER-JOHNSTON et al., Blood, (20150000), vol. 126, pages 851 - 7 | - HIDDEMANN et al., Blood, (20050000), vol. 106, pages 3725 - 32 | - RUMMEL et al., Lancet, (20130000), vol. 381, pages 1203 - 10 | - JURINOVIC et al., Biol Blood Marrow Transplant, (20180000), vol. 24, pages 1172 - 71 | - LEONARD et al., J Clin Oncol, (20190000), vol. 37, pages 1188 - 99 | - SALLES et al., Haematologica, (20170000), page el56 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 46 | - CHOTHIALESK, J Mol BioI, (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 17 | - BROCHET X., Nucl Acids Res, (20080000), vol. 36, pages W503 - 508 | - LEFRANC MP., Nucl Acids Res, vol. 27, (19990000), pages 209 - 12, URL: www.imgt.org | - EDELMAN et al., PNAS, (19690000), vol. 63, pages 78 - 85 | - HOLT et al., Trends Biotechnol, (20030000), vol. 21, pages 484 - 90 | - REVETS et al., Expert Opin Biol Ther, (20050000), vol. 5, pages 111 - 24 | - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 26 | - HUSTON et al., PNAS, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 83 | - E. MEYERSW. MILLER, Comput. Appl. Biosci, (19880000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, JMol Biol, (19700000), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453 | - KOHLERMILSTEIN, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | - MENDEZ et al., Nat Genet, (19970000), vol. 15, pages 146 - 56 | - CAS , no. 174722-31-7 | - Chemical Abstracts Service, no. 191732-72-6 | - BARRINGTON et al., J Clin Oncol, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 3048 - 58 | - OKEN et al., Am J Clin Oncol, (19821200), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 649 - 55 | - LEE et al., Biol Blood Marrow Transplant, (20190000), vol. 25, pages 625 - 638 | - HOWARD et al., N Engl J Med, (20110000), vol. 364, pages 1844 - 54 | - COIFFIER et al., J Clin Oncol, (20080000), vol. 26, pages 2767 - 78 | - LEFRANC et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 209 - 12 | - KONTERMANN, Drug Discov Today, (20150000), vol. 20, pages 838 - 47 | - MAbs, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 182 - 97 | - SHIELDS et al., JBC, (20010000), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 604 | - VAN DER HORST et al., Blood, (20190000), vol. 134, page 4066 | - WOLCHOK et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20090000), vol. 15, pages 7412 - 20 | - CHESON et al., Blood, (20160000), vol. 128, pages 2489 - 96 | US20100155133 |