EP4131684 - WIRE HARNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehirocho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKAWA, Hiroyuki c/o SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD., 1-14, Nishisuehirocho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstraße 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21777932.1 | 10.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP09458 | Priority number, date | JP20200059859 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020059859 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021199984 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131684 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04, H01B7/00, H01B7/285 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H01B7/285 (EP);
H01B7/282 (US);
H01B7/0045 (US);
H02G3/0406 (EP);
H05K9/0098 (US);
H02G3/0468 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H02G3/04, H01B7/00, H01B7/282 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | KABELBAUM | [2023/06] | English: | WIRE HARNESS | [2023/06] | French: | FAISCEAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2022 | Translation filed | 30.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 09.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/38] | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1835567 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]); | [A]US2019096543 (ITOU KENJI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2002186131 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [Y]JP2007250404 (YAZAKI CORP); | [Y]JP2007317480 (YAZAKI CORP); | [Y]JP2011155763 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [Y]JP2019062603 (YAZAKI CORP) | by applicant | JP2009135073 |