EP4088275 - 2D USER INTERFACE FOR A MUSICAL INSTRUMENT TO PLAY COMBINED CHORD AND MELODY SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/46] | 2D USER INTERFACE FOR A MUSICAL INSTRUMENT FOR PLAYING COMBINED SEQUENCES OF CHORDS AND TUNES, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
[2023/40] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Gabriel Gatzsche Holding GmbH Roter Hügel 7c 99331 Geratal OT Geschwenda / DE | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATZSCHE, Gabriel 99331 Geratal OT Geschwenda / DE | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Berliner Straße 1 07545 Gera / DE | [2024/08] |
Former [2022/46] | Werhahn, Jasper Carl Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Berliner Straße 1 07545 Gera / DE | Application number, filing date | 21777992.5 | 15.09.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021EP75330 | Priority number, date | DE202010125748 | 01.10.2020 Original published format: DE102020125748 | [2022/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022069227 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4088275 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4088275 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/34, G10H1/38 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G10H1/386 (EP);
G10H1/0008 (US);
G10H1/344 (EP);
G10H2210/105 (EP);
G10H2210/525 (EP);
G10H2210/571 (EP,US);
G10H2220/096 (EP,US);
G10H2220/161 (US);
G10H2220/251 (EP);
G10H2230/245 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2D BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN MUSIKINSTRUMENT ZUM SPIELEN VON KOMBINIERTEN AKKORD- UND MELODIEFOLGEN | [2023/40] | English: | 2D USER INTERFACE FOR A MUSICAL INSTRUMENT TO PLAY COMBINED CHORD AND MELODY SEQUENCES | [2023/40] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR 2D POUR INSTRUMENT DE MUSIQUE PERMETTANT DE JOUER DES SÉQUENCES COMBINÉES D'ACCORDS ET DE MÉLODIES | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/46] | 2D BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN MUSIKINSTRUMENT ZUM SPIELEN VON KOMBINIERTEN AKKORD- UND MELODIEFOLGEN UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | ||
Former [2022/46] | 2D USER INTERFACE FOR A MUSICAL INSTRUMENT FOR PLAYING COMBINED SEQUENCES OF CHORDS AND TUNES, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
Former [2022/46] | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR 2D POUR INSTRUMENT DE MUSIQUE POUR JOUER DES SÉQUENCES COMBINÉES D'ACCORDS ET DE MÉLODIES, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 21.02.2024 | |
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 21.05.2024 | |
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2003209130 (ANDERSON CLIFTON L [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,7-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0083] - [0088] - [0006] , [0036] - [0044]; figures 1,2,7-9 * [A] 2,4,6; | [YA]US2014137721 (LITTLE ALEC H [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,7-13 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 51] - [0055]; figures 1,15,18 * [A] 2,4,6; | [Y] - PETER S LANGSTON BELLCORE, "Little Languages for Music", USENIX, USENIX, THE ADVANCED COMPUTING SYSTEMS ASSOCIATION, (20081215), pages 1 - 96, XP061011674 [Y] 1,8,10,13 * paragraph [03.7] * | Examination | US2003209130 | US2014137721 | by applicant | US2003015087 | DE102008028328 | US2014137721 |