EP4216748 - PULSE BASED MULTI-MODAL BIOIMPEDANCE USER IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERLAAN, Theo 1206 Geneva / CH | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21778156.6 | 23.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021EP76190 | Priority number, date | EP20200198133 | 24.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20198133 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063890 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4216748 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/49, G16H20/13, G06F3/01, G06F21/32, G06F3/03, A24F40/53, G06F3/0346, G16H10/60, G16H40/63 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP);
A24F40/53 (EP);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G16H20/13 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | PULSBASIERTE MULTIMODALE BIOIMPEDANZBENUTZERIDENTIFIZIERUNG | [2023/31] | English: | PULSE BASED MULTI-MODAL BIOIMPEDANCE USER IDENTIFICATION | [2023/31] | French: | IDENTIFICATION MULTIMODALE D'UTILISATEUR PAR BIOIMPÉDANCE SUR LA BASE D'IMPULSIONS | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 14.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/15] | 05.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2014165185 (LANGE DANIEL H [IL]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0075] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2015122252 (FRIJA KEVIN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0064] ** figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US2015164144 (LIU QIUMING [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2016165450 (HUNT ALEXANDER [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 8, 10, 11 *; | [Y]US2018160734 (BATISTA RUI NUNO [CH], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP3711500 (NERUDIA LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0134] * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0119] *; | [Y] - MUNEHIKO SATO ET AL, "Zensei: Embedded, Multi-electrode Bioimpedance Sensing for Implicit, Ubiquitous User Recognition", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2017 CHI CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS , CHI '17, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20170502), doi:10.1145/3025453.3025536, ISBN 978-1-4503-4655-9, pages 3972 - 3985, XP058337608 [Y] 1-15 * figures 1, 2 * * abstract * * Section: "ZENSEI: WIDE-SPECTRUM BIOIMPEDANCE SENSING FOR OBJECT AUGMENTATION"; page 3974 - page 3976 * * Section "DISCUSSION"; page 3979 - page 3981 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3025453.3025536 | [Y] - MARTINOVIC IVAN ET AL, "Pulse-Response : Exploring Human Body Impedance for Biometric Recognition", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON PRIVACY AND SECURITY, 2 Penn Plaza, Suite 701 New York NY 10121-0701 USA, (20170528), vol. 20, no. 2, doi:10.1145/3064645, ISSN 2471-2566, pages 1 - 31, XP055776827 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * Section: PULSE-RESPONSE RECOGNITION; page 4 - page 5; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3064645 |