EP4208390 - HOLLOW GLASS CONTAINER HAVING A SPECIFIC LIP PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERALLIA PACKAGING Place des Corolles Tour Carpe Diem Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Eric 92260 FONTENAY AUX ROSES / FR | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21778175.6 | 02.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021FR51510 | Priority number, date | FR20200008973 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: FR 2008973 | [2023/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022049348 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208390 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4208390 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/10, B65D1/40 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
B65D1/10 (EP,US);
B65D1/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOHLGLASBEHÄLTER MIT SPEZIFISCHEM LIPPENPROFIL | [2023/28] | English: | HOLLOW GLASS CONTAINER HAVING A SPECIFIC LIP PROFILE | [2023/28] | French: | CONTENANT EN VERRE CREUX À PROFIL DE BUVANT SPÉCIFIQUE | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2748732 (VMC [FR]); | [A]GB2330133 (BEESON & SONS LTD [GB]); | [A]US2003021919 (GRANGER JACQUES [FR], et al); | [A]DE20321416U (HOFBRAEUHAUS TRAUNSTEIN JOSEF [DE]); | [A]FR2900143 (ALCAN PACKAGING CAPSULES [FR]) |