EP4131971 - IMAGE CODING METHOD BASED ON CHROMA DEBLOCKING PARAMETER INFORMATION FOR MONOCHROME COLOR FORMAT IN VIDEO OR IMAGE CODING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Jangwon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jungah IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
HEO, Jin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
YOO, Sunmi IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21778729.0 | 30.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021KR03896 | Priority number, date | US202063004434P | 02.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063004434 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021201551 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131971 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/86, H04N19/186, H04N19/70, H04N19/82 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H04N19/186 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/86 (EP,KR);
H04N19/117 (US);
H04N19/132 (KR,US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/46 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | BILDCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN AUF BASIS VON CHROMA-ENTBLOCKUNGSPARAMETERINFORMATIONEN FÜR EINFARBIGES FARBFORMAT IN EINEM VIDEO- ODER BILDCODIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/06] | English: | IMAGE CODING METHOD BASED ON CHROMA DEBLOCKING PARAMETER INFORMATION FOR MONOCHROME COLOR FORMAT IN VIDEO OR IMAGE CODING SYSTEM | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE BASÉ SUR DES INFORMATIONS DE PARAMÈTRES DE DÉBLOCAGE DE CHROMINANCE POUR UN FORMAT COULEUR MONOCHROME DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CODAGE DE VIDÉO OU D'IMAGE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2022 | Translation filed | 26.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017295369 (NAKAGAMI OHJI [JP]); | [E]WO2021155834 (BEIJING BYTEDANCE NETWORK TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [E]WO2021155740 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [E]WO2021170036 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]); | International search | [A]KR20140120346 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0031] and [0048]-[0051]; and claim 1. *; | [A]KR20160055771 (KT CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-3. *; | [YA]KR20160068288 (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN RES & BUS [KR]) [Y] 1-4,9-12,14-15 * See claims 1 and 3. * [A] 5-8,13; | [Y] - Benjamin Bross , Jianle Chen , Shan Liu , Ye-Kui Wang, "Versatile Video Coding (Draft 8)", 17. JVET meeting; 20200107 - 20200117; Brussels; (the Joint Video Exploration Team of ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 and ITU-T SG.16 ), (20200312), no. JVET-Q2001-vE, pages 1 - 510, XP030285390 [Y] 1-4,9-12,14-15 * See pages 45-50, 61, 100 and 116-117. * | [A] - L. Li (Tencent), X. Li, C. Auyeung, B. Choi, S. Wenger, S. Liu (Tencent), "AHG12: Signaling of chroma presence in PPS and APS", 17. JVET meeting; 20200107 - 20200117; Brussels; (the Joint Video Exploration Team of ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 and ITU-T SG.16 ), (20200101), XP030223458 [A] 1-15 * See pages 1-3. * |