EP4114054 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING INTER-SYSTEM MOBILITY IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Sangsoo 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Hoyeon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jinuk 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21779436.1 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021KR03860 | Priority number, date | KR20200039438 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200039438 | [2023/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021201535 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114054 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/02, H04W8/18, H04W76/10, H04W48/18, H04W76/12, H04W8/22 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04W8/22 (EP);
H04W8/02 (KR,US);
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W76/10 (KR);
H04W8/18 (KR);
H04W8/20 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | H04W8/02, H04W8/18, H04W76/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON MOBILITÄT ZWISCHEN SYSTEMEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING INTER-SYSTEM MOBILITY IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE MOBILITÉ ENTRE SYSTÈMES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2022 | Translation filed | 27.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2019078964 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,3,6-9,11,14,15 * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0158]; figure 2 * [A] 5,13 [Y] 2,10; | [YA]WO2019205027 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 2,10 * paragraph [0047] *[A] 1,3-9,11-15; | [XA]EP3487216 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,8,9,15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041]; figure 2 * [A] 2-7,10-14; | [E]EP3884707 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1,8,9,15 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0107]; figure 3 *; | [E]EP4175367 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,2,8-10,15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0082]; figure 3 *; | [XA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System architecture for the 5G System (5GS); Stage 2 (Release 16)", vol. SA WG2, no. V16.4.0, (20200327), pages 1 - 430, 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 23.501, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/Specs/archive/23_series/23.501/23501-g40.zip 23501-g40.docx, (20200327), XP051861090 [X] 1,4,6-9,12,14,15 * page 206 - page 207 * [A] 2,3,5,10,11,13 | International search | [A]KR20190082897 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0063]-[0676]; and figures 1-19. *; | [Y] - Ericsson, "PGW Selection and the Create Session Request message", 3GPP Draft; C4-201179, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20200227), XP051856298 [Y] 1-15 * See pages 1, 4-13 and 24. * | [Y] - Ericsson, "Emergency service at EPC-5GC interworking", 3GPP Draft; S2-2000283, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20200107), XP051842358 [Y] 1-15 * See pages 3 and 6. * | [Y] - Qualcomm Incorporated, "Support for the signalling of the capability for receiving WUS assistance information", 3GPP Draft; C1-201058, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20200227), XP051856647 [Y] 5,13 * See page 32. * | [A] - Ericsson, "Selecting the same PCF for AMF and an SMF in interworking scenarios", 3GPP Draft; S2-2001931, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20200218), XP051855335 [A] 1-15 * See pages 1-4. * |