EP4130161 - CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITION. BIOLOGICAL ELECTRODE, AND BIOLOGICAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAKATA, Masayuki c/o Nitto Denko Corporation, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21779876.8 | 26.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP13016 | Priority number, date | JP20200059652 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020059652 | JP20200192637 | 19.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020192637 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021200704 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130161 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08L101/02, H01B1/12, H01B1/20, A61B5/263, A61B5/268, C08L65/00, C08L101/12, C09D129/04, C09D165/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
C08L101/12 (EP);
A61B5/268 (EP,US);
C08L65/00 (EP);
C09D129/04 (EP);
C09D165/00 (EP);
G01N21/658 (US);
H01B1/12 (EP);
C08G2261/1424 (EP);
C08G2261/3223 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D129/04, C08L65/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | C08L101/00, C08L101/02, H01B1/12, H01B1/20, A61B5/263 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG. BIOLOGISCHE ELEKTRODE UND BIOLOGISCHER SENSOR | [2023/06] | English: | CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITION. BIOLOGICAL ELECTRODE, AND BIOLOGICAL SENSOR | [2023/06] | French: | COMPOSITION CONDUCTRICE, ÉLECTRODE BIOLOGIQUE ET CAPTEUR BIOLOGIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | Translation filed | 22.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 02.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012067490 (MIMOS BERHAD [MY], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6* paragraphs [0021] , [ 0039] , [ 0043]; claims 1, 6, 8 *; | [X]JP2019048945 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0059]; figure -; example -; claim -; table 1 *; | [XP]EP3683275 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0059]; example -; claim -; table 1 * | International search | [A]JP2009283410 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2016000363 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE)[A] 1-7; | [X]JP2019048945 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-5 * , claims, examples 1, 3-9, comparative example 1 * | by applicant | JP2016000363 | JP2016166436 | JP2020059652 | JP2020192637 |