EP4130885 - FERRITE PARTICLES, ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPER CARRIER CORE MATERIAL, ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPER CARRIER, AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-8557 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Makoto c/o Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-8557 / JP | 02 /
UEMURA, Tetsuya c/o Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-8557 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21779984.0 | 17.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP10912 | Priority number, date | JP20200062122 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020062122 | JP20200068146 | 06.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020068146 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021200171 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130885 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/107, G03G9/113, C01G49/00, C04B35/26 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G03G9/1075 (EP);
G03G9/1085 (EP,US);
C01G49/0072 (EP);
C04B35/26 (EP);
C04B35/2625 (US);
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B41/4535 (EP);
C04B41/48 (EP);
G03G9/0821 (US);
G03G9/1131 (EP);
G03G9/1132 (EP,US);
C01P2002/32 (EP);
C01P2002/34 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/80 (EP);
C01P2006/10 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/42 (EP);
C04B2235/3206 (EP);
C04B2235/3213 (EP);
C04B2235/3244 (EP);
C04B2235/3248 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3262 (EP);
C04B2235/3274 (US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP);
C04B2235/663 (EP);
C04B2235/763 (EP,US);
C04B2235/768 (EP,US);
C04B2235/85 (EP);
C04B2235/963 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | G03G9/107, G03G9/113 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | FERRITTEILCHEN, KERNMATERIAL FÜR ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHEN ENTWICKLERTRÄGER, ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHER ENTWICKLERTRÄGER UND ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHER ENTWICKLER | [2023/06] | English: | FERRITE PARTICLES, ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPER CARRIER CORE MATERIAL, ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPER CARRIER, AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPER | [2023/06] | French: | PARTICULES DE FERRITE, MATÉRIAU DE COEUR DE SUPPORT DE RÉVÉLATEUR ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE, SUPPORT DE RÉVÉLATEUR ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE ET RÉVÉLATEUR ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2022 | Translation filed | 28.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1612612 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]); | [XA]JP2011118380 (CANON KK); | [XP]WO2020175326 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]WO2020175336 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [XA]JPH01291406 (MITSUBISHI MINING & CEMENT CO, et al) [X] 1-8 * claims * [A] 9-12; | [A]JP2006017828 (POWDERTECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * claims 1, 7, paragraphs [0046]-[0049] *; | [X]JP2011118380 (CANON KK) [X] 1-12 * claims, paragraphs [0022]-[0040], examples *; | [X]JP2019159124 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0049], examples *; | [PX]WO2020175326 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-12 * claims, examples *; | [PX]WO2020175336 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-12* claims, examples * | by applicant | JP5886336B | JP2016106262 |