EP4131316 - POWER DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY DETECTING ENTRY AND EXIT POSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. LS Tower 127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14119 / KR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young 40, LS-ro 116beon-gil, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14118 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Min-Kyu 40, LS-ro 116beon-gil, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14118 / KR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Karolinen Karree Karlstraße 12 80333 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21780263.6 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021KR03874 | Priority number, date | KR20200041146 | 03.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200041146 | [2023/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021201538 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131316 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/52, H01H71/04, H01H71/06, H02B11/127, H02B11/10 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H02B11/167 (EP,US);
H01H71/522 (KR);
H02B1/36 (US);
H01H71/04 (KR);
H01H71/06 (KR);
H02B11/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H01H71/52, H01H71/04, H01H71/06, H02B11/127 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN ERKENNUNG VON EIN- UND AUSSTIEGSPOSITIONEN | [2023/06] | English: | POWER DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY DETECTING ENTRY AND EXIT POSITIONS | [2023/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PUISSANCE PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER EN CONTINU DES POSITIONS D'ENTRÉE ET DE SORTIE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2022 | Translation filed | 07.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 08.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR200340100Y ; | [A]WO2017011536 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH], et al); | [IA]CN107275970 (ZHONGKE ELECTRIC POWER EQUIPMENT GROUP CO LTD); | [IA]CN109861125 (YINCHUAN LIHENG ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) | International search | [A]KR19990055497 ; | [Y]KR200340100Y ; | [Y]KR20110037793 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20130000281 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2014033590 (CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER) |