Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12009642 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2024 | B2 | US2023144848 | 11.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200041146 | 03.04.2020 | WO2021KR03874 | 29.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7458501B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2024 | B2 | JP2023519327 | 10.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200041146 | 03.04.2020 | WO2021KR03874 | 29.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115335946 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200041146 | 03.04.2020 | WO2021KR03874 | 29.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4131316 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2023 | A4 | EP4131316 | 08.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200041146 | 03.04.2020 | WO2021KR03874 | 29.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021201538 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200041146 | 03.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102378389B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2022 | B1 | KR20210123686 | 14.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200041146 | 03.04.2020 |