EP4125338 - IMPROVED POLYNUCLEOTIDES FOR EXPRESSION OF RNA-GUIDED NUCLEASES AND DNA BINDING PROTEINS IN SOYBEAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inari Agriculture Technology, Inc. One Kendall Square Building 600/700, Suite 7-501 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEVAN, Scott A. c/o Inari Agriculture, Inc. One Kendall Square Building 600/700, Suite 7-501 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
JOYCE, Adam P. c/o Inari Agriculture, Inc. One Kendall Square Building 600/700, Suite 7-501 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21780273.5 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US24681 | Priority number, date | US202063001806P | 30.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063001806 P | US202063072585P | 31.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063072585 P | US202063075395P | 08.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063075395 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021202397 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4125338 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/00, C12N5/10, C12N9/22, C12N15/11, C12N15/113, C12N15/55, C12N15/82 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
C12N15/8213 (EP,US);
A01H5/10 (EP);
A01H6/542 (EP);
C12N9/22 (EP);
Y02A40/146 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | A01H5/00, C12N5/10, C12N9/22, C12N15/11, C12N15/113, C12N15/55 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE POLYNUKLEOTIDE ZUR EXPRESSION VON RNA-GEFÜHRTEN NUKLEASEN UND DNA-BINDENDEN PROTEINEN IN SOJABOHNEN | [2023/06] | English: | IMPROVED POLYNUCLEOTIDES FOR EXPRESSION OF RNA-GUIDED NUCLEASES AND DNA BINDING PROTEINS IN SOYBEAN | [2023/06] | French: | POLYNUCLÉOTIDES AMÉLIORÉS POUR L'EXPRESSION DE NUCLÉASES GUIDÉES PAR L'ARN ET DE PROTÉINES DE LIAISON À L'ADN DANS LE SOJA | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 26.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017070029 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]); | International search | [A]US6072050 (BOWEN BENJAMIN A [US], et al); | [A]US2019144852 (ZHAO HUIMIN [US], et al); | [A]US2019264218 (SHULTZ RANDALL WILLIAM [US], et al); | [A]US2019352655 (NIU YAJIE [US], et al); |