EP4128355 - META-OPTICS-BASED SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OCULAR APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Juejun 292 Nevada St. Newton, MA 02460 / US | 02 /
GU, Tian 4116 River Forth Dr. Fairfax, VA 22030 / US | 03 /
SHALAGINOV, Mikhail 40 Dickinson St., Apt. 2 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 04 /
YANG, Fan 235 Albany Street, Ashdown 4008B Cabridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21780395.6 | 01.02.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US16064 | Priority number, date | US202063003782P | 01.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063003782 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021201965 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128355 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, A61B3/00, A61B3/12, G02B1/00, G02B5/18, G02B27/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A61B3/12 (EP,US);
A61B3/14 (EP,US);
G02B1/002 (EP,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | METAOPTIKBASIERTE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUGENANWENDUNGEN | [2023/06] | English: | META-OPTICS-BASED SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OCULAR APPLICATIONS | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES FONDÉS SUR UNE MÉTA-OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS D'APPLICATIONS OCULAIRES | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2018275409 (GAO CHUNYU [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0113] * [A] 10-15; | [YA]WO2019119025 (SEEING MACHINES LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027] * [A] 10-15; | [A] - LI BO ET AL, "Metalens-Based Miniaturized Optical Systems", MICROMACHINES, (20190508), vol. 10, no. 310, doi:10.3390/mi10050310, pages 1 - 21, XP055791779 [A] 1-15 * figure 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/mi10050310 | International search | [A]US2015289762 (POPOVICH MILAN MOMCILO [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2017010466 (KLUG MICHAEL ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2017109562 (SHROFF SAPNA [US], et al) [A] 1-22* entire document *; | [A]US2018275409 (GAO CHUNYU [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2019044003 (HECK JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]WO2019148200 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]WO2019165620 (CHEN TAI KUO [CN]) [A] 1-22 * machine translation * |