EP4127131 - MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS OF DESIGNING AND USING MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Javelin Biotech, Inc. 299 Washington Street Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRIT, Murat 299 Washington Street Woburn, Massachusetts 01801 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21780619.9 | 30.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US24899 | Priority number, date | US202016834235 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: US202016834235 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021202539 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4127131 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/00, B01L3/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C12M23/16 (EP,KR,US);
C12M35/08 (EP,KR);
C12M23/34 (KR);
C12M29/10 (US);
C12N5/0653 (US);
C12N5/0658 (US);
C12N5/0686 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTWERFEN UND VERWENDEN MIKROFLUIDISCHER VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/06] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS OF DESIGNING AND USING MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES | [2023/06] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MICROFLUIDIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONCEPTION ET D'UTILISATION DE DISPOSITIFS MICROFLUIDIQUES | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.07.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03027223 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,12 * figure 1; claims 1,23, 38 * [I] 2-5,7-11,13-15; | [A]WO2011014674 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2013086329 (RES TRIANGLE INST [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 21, lines 12-15; figures 3,4; claims 1, 10-12 * [I] 2-5,7-15 | International search | [A]US2019032021 (INGBER DONALD E [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 20-28* ; entire document *; | [X] - Edington Collin D., Chen Wen Li Kelly, Geishecker Emily, Kassis Timothy, Soenksen Luis R., Bhushan Brij M., Freake Duncan, Kirschner Jared, Maass Christian, Tsamandouras Nikolaos, Valdez Jorge, Cook Christi D., Parent Tom, Snyder Stephen, Yu Jiajie, Suter Emily, Shockley Michael, Velazquez Jason, Velazquez Jeremy J., Stockdale Linda, Papps Julia P., Lee Iris, Vann Nicholas, Gamboa Mario, Labarge Matthew E., Zhong Zhe, Wang Xin, Boyer Laurie A., Lauffenburger Douglas A., Carrier Rebecca L., Communal Catherine, Tannenbaum Steven R., Stokes Cynthia L., Hughes David J., Rohatgi Gaurav, Trumper David L., Cirit Murat, Griffith Linda G., "Interconnected Microphysiological Systems for Quantitative Biology and Pharmacology Studies", Scientific Reports, (20181201), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-018-22749-0, page 4530, XP055870204 [X] 1-9, 20-28 * ; especially abstract; pg 2, para 6; pg 3, para 2-4; pg 4, para 2 - pg 5, para 1; pg 5, para 4; pg 6, para 1; pg 9, para 3; pg 9, para 5; pg 11, para 5; pg 11, para 7; pg 13, para 2; Figures 2, 4, 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-018-22749-0 |