EP4084060 - BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY, COMPOSITE BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID COMPOSITE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/44] | BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY, COMPOSITE BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID COMPOSITE BODY, AND HEAT DISSIPATION MEMBER | ||
[2024/26] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denka Company Limited 1-1 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKARASHI, Koki c/o Denka Company Limited, 1-1, Nihonbashi- Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Makoto c/o Denka Company Limited, 1-1, Nihonbashi- Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 03 /
KOBASHI, Seiji c/o Denka Company Limited, 1-1, Nihonbashi- Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 04 /
NISHIMURA, Koji c/o Denka Company Limited, 1-1, Nihonbashi- Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 21781186.8 | 26.03.2021 | [2022/44] | WO2021JP13053 | Priority number, date | JP20200064585 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020064585 | [2022/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021200724 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084060 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/373, C04B38/00, C04B41/83, C04B35/583, H05K7/20, C04B35/626, C04B41/00, C04B41/48, C08K3/38, H01L23/15, // C04B35/64 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H01L23/3731 (EP);
C04B41/4853 (EP,US);
C04B35/583 (EP,US);
C04B35/62675 (EP);
C04B35/62685 (EP);
C04B35/6303 (US);
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (EP);
C04B38/0054 (US);
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B41/48 (EP);
C04B41/83 (EP,US);
C08K3/38 (EP);
C09K5/14 (US);
H01L23/15 (EP);
H01L23/3733 (EP);
C04B2201/32 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3821 (EP);
C04B2235/3856 (EP);
C04B2235/386 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP);
C04B2235/442 (US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (US);
C04B2235/6586 (EP);
C04B2235/77 (US);
C04B2235/783 (EP);
C04B2235/786 (EP);
C04B2235/787 (EP);
C04B2235/94 (EP);
C04B2235/95 (EP);
C04B2235/96 (EP);
C04B2235/9607 (EP);
C04B35/62615 (EP);
C08K2003/385 (EP);
H01L23/3737 (EP);
H05K1/0373 (US);
H05K2201/0209 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/00, C04B35/583, C04B38/0054, C04B38/0074 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/583, C04B38/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/44] | H01L23/373, C04B38/00, C04B41/83, C04B35/583, H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | SINTERKÖRPER AUS BORNITRID, VERBUNDKÖRPER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GESINTERTEN BORNITRIDKÖRPERS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES VERBUNDKÖRPERS | [2024/26] | English: | BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY, COMPOSITE BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID COMPOSITE BODY | [2024/26] | French: | CORPS FRITTÉ AU NITRURE DE BORE, CORPS COMPOSITE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DUDIT CORPS FRITTÉ AU NITRURE DE BORE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DUDIT CORPS COMPOSIT | [2024/26] |
Former [2022/44] | SINTERKÖRPER AUS BORNITRID, VERBUNDKÖRPER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GESINTERTEN BORNITRIDKÖRPERS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES VERBUNDKÖRPERS UND WÄRMEABLEITUNGSELEMENT | ||
Former [2022/44] | BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY, COMPOSITE BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID COMPOSITE BODY, AND HEAT DISSIPATION MEMBER | ||
Former [2022/44] | CORPS FRITTÉ AU NITRURE DE BORE, CORPS COMPOSITE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DUDIT CORPS FRITTÉ AU NITRURE DE BORE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DUDIT CORPS COMPOSITE ET ÉLÉMENT DE DISSIPATION DE CHALEUR | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2022 | Translation filed | 29.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 04.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2018230352 (TAKEDA GO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-11,14 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0062] * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]US2019092695 (NISHI TAIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-10,14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *[Y] 12,13 | International search | [XY]JP2005343728 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-3,8,9 * 1 - 4 1 - 4 * [Y] 4-9; | [Y]WO2014136959 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [Y] 6-9 * [00 2 4 ] *; | [XY]WO2014196496 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * 2 - 3 2 - 3 * [Y] 4-9; | [XY]WO2017034003 (DENKA COMPANY LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * 1 - 8 1 - 8 * [Y] 4-9; | [A]JP2017165609 (DENKA CO LTD) [A] 1-14; | [XY]JP2019073409 (DENKA CO LTD) [X] 1-3,7-9 * 1 - 9 1 - 9 * [Y] 4-9; | [A]JP2019525883 [A] 1-14 | by applicant | JP2014162697 | JP2019073409 |