EP4127802 - RUGGEDIZED PUSH-PULL FIBER OPTIC CONNECTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Yu CommScope, Attention: IP Legal Department, 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 02 /
KOSTECKA, Ryan CommScope, Attention: IP Legal Department, 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 03 /
DIEPSTRATEN, Patrick Jacques Ann CommScope, Attention: IP Legal Department, 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21781363.3 | 02.04.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US25599 | Priority number, date | US202063004400P | 02.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063004400 P | US202063089678P | 09.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063089678 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203012 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127802 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G02B6/3825 (EP,US);
G02B6/3831 (US);
G02B6/3849 (EP,US);
G02B6/389 (EP);
G02B6/3891 (EP,US);
G02B6/3893 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ROBUSTE PUSH-PULL-GLASFASERVERBINDUNGSSYSTEME | [2023/06] | English: | RUGGEDIZED PUSH-PULL FIBER OPTIC CONNECTION SYSTEMS | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CONNEXION POUSSER-TIRER POUR FIBRES OPTIQUES RENFORCÉS PAR PASTILLE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 10.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN108318975 (FIBERHOME TELECOMMUNICATION TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,9,11,13 * figures 1-10 * * paragraphs [0075] - [0136] * * claim 3 *[I] 2-8,10,12,14,15; | [XI]CN109239857 (YANGTZE OPTICAL FIBRE & CABLE JOINT STOCK LTD CO) [X] 1-4,6,9,11,13 * figures 1-9, 11, 12 * * paragraphs [0013] , [ 0028] , [ 0029] * * claims 8, 9 * [I] 5,7,8,10,12,14,15 | International search | [XY]WO2018065293 (HUBER SUHNER [CH]) [X] 1-8,16-17,28-29 * pages 3, 15-17 and figures 4-6, 10-12 * [Y] 30-41; | [Y]WO2019006195 (CORNING RES & DEV CORP [US]) [Y] 30-41 * paragraphs [0119]-[0121] and figures 40-51 *; | [A]US2019041587 (WALDRON MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-8,16-17,28-41* claim 1 and figure 3 *; | [A]US2019137697 (JENSEN JOSEPH CLINTON [US], et al) [A] 1-8,16-17,28-41 * claim 1 and figure 3 *; | [A]US2019384017 (LU YU [US]) [A] 1-8,16-17,28-41 * paragraphs [0047]-[0052] and figure 7 * |