Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
16.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.06.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.01.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
06.01.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
13.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.09.2022 | Change - representative | |
19.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.06.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
08.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |