Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023152530 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063004400 | 02.04.2020 | US202063089678 | 09.10.2020 | US202117916480 | 02.04.2021 | WO2021US25599 | 02.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021246105 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063004400 | 02.04.2020 | US202063089678 | 09.10.2020 | WO2021US25599 | 02.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4127802 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | A4 | EP4127802 | 08.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063004400 | 02.04.2020 | US202063089678 | 09.10.2020 | WO2021US25599 | 02.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021203012 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063004400 | 02.04.2020 | US202063089678 | 09.10.2020 |