EP3950603 - DRINKING WATER PURIFICATION SYSTEM COMPRISING A BACKWASHABLE FILTER CARTRIDGE AND A NANOFILTRATION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/06] | BACKWASHABLE FILTER ELEMENT-NANOFILTRATION DRINKING WATER DEEP PURIFICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2024/06] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greentech Environment Co., Ltd. 16F, Building A, Motorola Building No. 1, Wangjiang East Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Mu Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
Lin, Xiaofeng Beijing 100102 / CN | 03 /
Li, Zehua Beijing 100102 / CN | 04 /
Su, Yingqiang Beijing 100102 / CN | 05 /
Niu, Xiaohong Beijing 100102 / CN | 06 /
Han, Huiming Beijing 100102 / CN | 07 /
Zhang, Xiaofang Beijing 100102 / CN | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Vitina, Maruta, et al Agency TRIA ROBIT P.O. Box 22 1010 Riga / LV | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 21782426.7 | 12.05.2021 | [2022/06] | WO2021CN93334 | Priority number, date | CN202010521051 | 10.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010521051 | [2022/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021249096 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950603 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3950603 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/44, // C02F1/00, C02F103/02, C02F101/14, C02F101/10 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C02F1/442 (EP,CN,US);
B01D61/04 (US);
B01D61/027 (US);
B01D65/02 (US);
C02F9/00 (US);
B01D65/08 (US);
C02F1/001 (US);
C02F1/008 (EP);
C02F2101/101 (EP);
C02F2101/14 (EP);
C02F2103/02 (EP);
C02F2201/005 (EP);
C02F2201/006 (EP);
C02F2209/005 (EP);
C02F2209/03 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | C02F1/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRINKWASSERREINIGUNGSSYSTEM MIT RÜCKSPÜLBARER FILTERPATRONE UND NANOFILTRATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/06] | English: | DRINKING WATER PURIFICATION SYSTEM COMPRISING A BACKWASHABLE FILTER CARTRIDGE AND A NANOFILTRATION UNIT | [2024/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PURIFICATION DE L'EAU POTABLE COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT LAVABLE À CONTRE-COURANT ET UNE UNITÉ DE NANOFILTRATION | [2024/06] |
Former [2022/06] | BACKWASHABLE FILTER ELEMENT-NANOFILTRATION DRINKING WATER DEEP PURIFICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2022/06] | SYSTÈME DE PURIFICATION PROFONDE DE L'EAU POTABLE PAR NANOFILTRATION À ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT LAVABLE À CONTRE-COURANT | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2021 | Translation filed | 11.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 01.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102009017125 (HEYBACH KLAUS [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012071815 (KUNSHAN HUAKE INST OF BIOPOLYMER CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]CN102874902 (UNIV ZHEJIANG GONGSHANG); | [X]US2014048483 (MAEDA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]KR20020062213 (BORGWARDT JORG [KR], et al); | [X]CN201362626Y (JIANGXI JDL ENVIRONMENTAL PROT [CN]); | [A]CN201908008U (CHENGDU DRAGON WATER TREAT TECHNOLOGY RES INST); | [A]CN202717661U (SUN BIN); | [X]CN104386873 (SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CT QINGDAO WATER GROUP CO LTD); | [PX]CN111646545 (GREENTECH ENV CO LTD) |